judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00029-CR
10-81-00029-CR
09/16/1981
Aggravated Robbery
William Bradford
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/14/1983Case stored
02/14/1983Mandate issued by this Court
10/07/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/09/1982Submitted
09/16/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/14/2083Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
82nd District Court
Falls
4964
40 Years