judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00028-CR
10-81-00028-CR
09/16/1981
Burglary of a Habitation
Anthony Quinn Coleman
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/08/1982Case stored
07/08/1982Mandate issued by this Court
05/06/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1982Submitted
09/16/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
54th District Court
McLennan
80-353-C
5 Years