judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD KIRBY JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0239)
Case Number:S-10-0239Case Docketed On:11/05/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:RONALD KIRBY JONES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RONALD KIRBY JONES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald Kirby JonesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 114
Citation:256 P.3d 527

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/05/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/05/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/05/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/22/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/04/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/15/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/16/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/24/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/01/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/26/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/11/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/11/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/11/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/12/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal