judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CALHOON VS. VALLEY ROCK AND SAND

Case Information: 34860
Short Caption:CALHOON VS. VALLEY ROCK AND SANDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 30901
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV14236Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08951
09/21/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/21/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/04/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Dwight E. Duncan--check no. 102.
10/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 10/1/99. 99-09494
10/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: October 1, 1999. 99-09862
11/19/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 3, 1999. 99-11596
12/08/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 16, 1999. 99-12298
04/24/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge will initiate a telephone status conference with counsel the week of May 15, 2000. 00-06565
07/24/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-12780
07/24/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days.
08/03/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-13477
08/11/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-14011
08/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Motion Granted in Part. Appellant shall have 15 days of the date of this order to file and serve the docketing statement. We deny appellant's counsel's request for guidance concerning completion of the docketing statement and direct counsel to complete the docketing statement to the best of his ability. 00-14684
09/08/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-15837
09/12/2000Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 00-16059
09/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Service for Response to Docketing Statement. 00-16060
09/12/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Notice of Appeal was Premature. 00-16061
09/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing for Motion to Dismiss Appeal as Notice of Appeal was Premature. 00-16062
10/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Appellant shall also submit points and authorities. We defer ruling on respondents' motion to dismiss the appeal pending receipt and consideration of appellant's response to our order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. 00-17820
12/12/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On September 12, 2000, respondents filed a motion to dismiss appellant's appel. Appellant did not file a response to the motion. To date, appellant has failed to respond to our October 9, 2000, order. We grant respondents' motion and "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-21733
12/18/2000Other Other. Received a returned copy of the order filed 12/12/00 addressed to Dwight Duncan. Label from the post office placed on the envelope reads Moved left no address, Unable to forward and Return to sender.
01/09/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21811
01/09/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21811