judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROEVER (LERLENE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34859
Short Caption:ROEVER (LERLENE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 29647
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR1973Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/27/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for Appellant). 99-08942
09/28/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
10/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: October 7, 1999. 99-10101
10/27/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 26, 1999. Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 99-10535
11/04/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 27, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 99-10806
11/23/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to File Docketing Statement and Fast Track Statement. 99-11733
12/02/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. July 28, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Laurie Webb. 99-12058
12/06/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Affidavit of Mailing the Motion to Extend time to file Docketing Statement and Fast Track Statement. (Envelope enclosed but no copy to be returned). 99-12172
12/30/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 29, 1999. Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 99-13410
01/20/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: July 30, 1999. Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 00-00912
02/17/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 2, 1999. Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 00-02535
02/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-02804
03/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On November 23, 1999, appellant's counsel filed a "motion to extend time to file to file docketing statemetn and fast track statement." We deny the motion to the extent that it requests an extension of time to file a fast track statement. We grant the motion for an extension to file the docketing statement. We direct the clerk to file, forthwith, the docketing statement provisionally received on November 4, 1999. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript pursuant to NRAP 9(a). fn1[Appellant need not request those transcripts already on file with this court.] Appellant shall within 20 days of the date of this order file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Failure to comply with this order or our rules of appellate procedure may result in the imposition of sanctions. fn2[On February 22, 2000, appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. The motion does not specify the amount of time requested and is denied.] 00-03372
03/03/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-10850
03/22/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Second request. 00-04597
03/22/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: August 3, 1999. To Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 00-04598
03/28/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 3, 1999. Court Reporter: Jane V. Michaels. 00-04974
04/03/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant appellant's March 22, 2000, motion. Appellant shall file and serve the opening brief and appendix on or before April 7, 2000. No further extensions shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 00-05292
04/11/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 4/7/00. 00-05785
04/12/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 00-05850
05/11/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 5/11/00. 00-07849
06/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-10947
06/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
01/30/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. " . . . we affirm Roever's conviction." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB 01-01985
02/27/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-02078
02/27/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 2, 2001. 01-02078