judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE PETITION OF MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY FOR THE EXCLUSION FROM THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT: MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY v. THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER & SEWER DISTRICT

Case Heading (S-10-0238)
Case Number:S-10-0238Case Docketed On:11/04/2010
Linked To: S-10-0199
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Rule 12.09(b) Certification - Civil - Water (Title 41)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE PETITION OF MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY FOR THE EXCLUSION FROM THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT: MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY v. THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER & SEWER DISTRICT
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE PETITION OF MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY FOR THE EXCLUSION FROM THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER AND SEWER DISTRICT: MOUNTAIN CEMENT COMPANY, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE SOUTH OF LARAMIE WATER & SEWER DISTRICT, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMountain Cement CompanyPhilip A. Nicholas
Mitchell H. Edwards
AppelleeThe South of Laramie Water & Sewer DistrictKermit C. Brown
Other Particpants
Interested ObserverAlbany County AttorneyRichard C. Bohling
James P. Schermetzler

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Taxation
Opinion Number:2011 WY 81
Citation:255 P.3d 881

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/20/2010Event - Phone Call to District Judge re order, he believes counsel wants review of certified questions he answeredEventPhone CallFinal
10/21/2010Event - Phone Call to counsel for Mountain Cement, he will get with other counsel to decide what they really want to file. Advised him review of a District Court's answers to certified questions must be thru Rule 13.EventPhone CallFinal
11/03/2010Event - Phone Call - counsel for Mountain Cement again, he will talk to other counsel and let the Court know how they want to proceed in Supreme Court.EventPhone CallFinal
11/04/2010Event - Phone Call from counsel for Mountain Cement, they want the case docketed as a 12.09(b) certificationEventPhone CallFinal
11/04/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/04/2010Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/04/2010Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Order of certification Rule 12.09(b)Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOrder of certification Rule 12.09(b)Final
11/04/2010Event - Phone Call to District Court requesting Petition for Review, office will fax copyEventPhone CallFinal
11/16/2010Order - Rule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptOrderRule 12.09(b) Certification - AcceptFinal
11/22/2010Notice-Incoming - IndexNotice-IncomingIndexFinal
01/03/2011Brief - Appellant; and statement of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
01/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
01/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Appellant's Statement of CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/18/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee - The south of Laramie water and sewer district.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/22/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/24/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kermit C. Brown for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/03/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Mitchell Edwards for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/09/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/09/2011Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Edwards indicating that Phil Nicholas will present argument on behalf of appellant.EventPhone CallFinal
03/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/14/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/14/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Mitchell H. Edwards and Philip A. Nicholas, argument by Mr. Nicholas for appellant; Kermit C. Brown and Elisa M. Butler, argument by Mr. Brown for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/13/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/03/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/2/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal