judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNNIE DIOR SHIELDS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1399
Short Caption:JOHNNIE DIOR SHIELDS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-18537-08Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:02/22/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohnnie D. Shields Y
James W. KleinNY
Jonathan W. Anderson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Chrisellen R. KolbNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (31 pgs/tape) 6/23/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (61 pgs/Maddox) 6/24/10 proc. s.m.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (44 pgs/tape) 6/24/10 proc. a.m.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (116 pgs/Maar) 6/28/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (117-291 pgs/Maar) 6/29/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (109 pgs/Price) 6/30/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (17 pgs/tape) 9/17/10 proc.
02/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (28 pgs/tape) 10/6/10 proc. w/cd
02/22/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/01/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/02/2011RECORD INDEX
03/02/2011RECORD COPIES
03/02/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (Request for removal from PSA supervision report filed 9/1/10)
04/06/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO REMAND (Judge Morin's Statement of Intent attached)
04/12/2011APPELLEE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION to 30 days. no oppo
05/13/2011RECEIVED appellee's answer/response
06/02/2011ORDERED that appellee's motion is granted and the Clerk shall file the lodged response. F/O that appellant's motion is granted and the case is remanded to the SSuperior Court for further proceedings consistent with the statements made in appellant's motion. F/O tha the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith.(ETW)
06/02/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION
06/02/2011REMANDED
06/13/2011MANDATE ISSUED