judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-81-00830-CR
01-81-00830-CR
11/09/1981
Burglary
Freeman, Ruben Natt
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/08/1983Stay issuance of mandateMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
08/31/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
08/29/1983Stay issuance of mandate
07/22/1983Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
06/29/1983No description available.Refused
04/18/1983No description available.
03/03/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/30/1982Submission
10/21/1982Brief filed
09/16/1982Record filed
11/09/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/31/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SE
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
323,853
10 years