judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01152-CR
05-81-01152-CR
11/04/1981
Burglary
Walker, Al Frederick
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/09/1984Mandate Issued
03/15/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1982Submitted
06/21/1982Brief Filed
05/21/1982Brief Filed
04/29/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/31/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/25/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
10/15/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/28/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Ron Chapman
F81-10421-H
25 Years TDC