judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00007-CR
04-82-00007-CR
11/05/1981
Other Felony
Fox, Matthew James
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/27/1984Mandate Issued
01/27/1984Mandate Issued
11/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/23/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/26/1983Submission
07/26/1983Submitted
06/30/1982Waives Oral Argument
06/30/1982Brief Filed
06/30/1982Case ready to be set
06/30/1982Case ready to be set
06/10/1982Brief Filed
05/17/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/15/1982Record Filed
04/13/1982Record Approved
01/13/1982Notice of appeal received
01/13/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
01/06/1982Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
227th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
81-CR-0082-W
Ten Years