judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00130-CR
09-81-00130-CR
11/06/1981
Other Felony
Askew, Bruce Douglas
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/16/1982Mandate Issued
12/30/1981Opinion issuedNo Description Available.
12/21/1981Brief Filed
12/07/1981Brief Filed
11/06/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/16/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
38007
10 Years