judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01143-CR
05-81-01143-CR
11/04/1981
Aggravated Robbery
James Robert Beene
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/19/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedPro Se
03/02/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
02/08/1982Anders brief filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/23/2016Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/21/1985Letter received
04/25/1985Letter issued by the court
12/02/1982Letter issued by the court
11/22/1982Letter received
05/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/19/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/11/1982Letter received
03/11/1982Letter issued by the court
03/02/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/08/1982Anders brief filed
01/13/1982Reporters record filed
01/13/1982Clerks record filed
11/04/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
11/04/1981Docketing statement filed
01/31/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/14/1982Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Beene, James RobertCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
283rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 283rd District Court
F81-4049-RQMT
50 years