judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00263-CR
08-81-00263-CR
11/10/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Cuddy, Donald LeRoy
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
06/15/1984Decision from Supreme Court or CCAAffirmed
02/03/1984Petition for Discretionary ReviewMotion or Writ Granted
10/21/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/14/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
10/05/1983Order enteredMotion or Writ Denied
08/24/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/10/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/29/1983Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
07/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/29/1983Submitted
03/16/1983Submission
11/08/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
11/01/1982Brief Filed
10/13/1982Filed Ltr re req. for oral argument
10/01/1982Brief Filed
08/18/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
07/21/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/09/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
05/19/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/05/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
04/19/1982Record filed.
11/10/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/03/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
36165-168
30 Yrs.k