judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01140-CR
05-81-01140-CR
11/04/1981
Assault or Attempted Murder
Smith, Glenn Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1984Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/20/1984Case Forwarded to Higher CourtReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
06/23/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
06/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/28/1983Case Returned from Higher Ct.Motion or Writ Granted
01/24/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
01/03/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1982Submission
11/04/1981Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/04/1981Brief Filed
11/04/1981Brief Filed
11/04/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/05/1984Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable R. T. Scales
f80-13848-in
Life, TDC