judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00403-CV
04-81-00403-CV
11/04/1981
Divorce
Olivares, Sara
Olivares, Damaso
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/22/1983Mandate Issued
02/22/1983Mandate Issued
01/05/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/05/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/23/1982Case ready to be set
12/23/1982Case ready to be set
06/02/1982Requests Oral Argument
05/19/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
04/19/1982Brief Filed
04/19/1982Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
03/24/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/22/1982Response to Motion Filed
03/17/1982No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/17/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1982Brief Filed
02/16/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/29/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/17/1981No Description Available.
11/04/1981No Description Available.
11/04/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/17/1981Appeal Bond Filed
07/27/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
150th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Peter Michael Curry
80-CI-11994