judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00257-CR
08-81-00257-CR
11/06/1981
All Misdemeanors
Rojas, Salvador A.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/08/1984Shuck purged
06/04/1984Mandate Issued
01/23/1984Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/14/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/17/1983Submitted
10/12/1983Submission
03/25/1983Case ready to be set
02/23/1983Brief Filed
02/23/1983Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/09/1983Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
01/26/1983Order entered
09/15/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/10/1982No description available.
09/02/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
08/16/1982No description available.
06/30/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/30/1982Order entered
06/14/1982No description available.
05/17/1982Record filed.
03/17/1982Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/04/1982Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
11/06/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/04/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
County Court
Crane
2525
18 Mo. + $500.