judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01153-CR
05-81-01153-CR
11/04/1981
Forgery
Williams, Donald Eugene
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/14/1985Mandate IssuedCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
04/25/1985Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/11/1985Opinion issuedCt App Rev & Jud Tr Ct Affirmd
02/22/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1983Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
02/08/1983Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
10/06/1982Submission
03/19/1982Brief Filed
01/18/1982Brief Filed
12/21/1981Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/04/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/14/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John D. Ovard
F81-10357-IR
Life, tdc