judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00259-CR
08-81-00259-CR
11/06/1981
Other Drug Sale
De La Mora, Jose Francisco
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
03/22/1983Mandate Issued
12/29/1982Judgment IssuedDismissed
12/29/1982Motion to Withdraw Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1982Motion to Withdraw Counsel Filed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
11/06/1981Brief Filed
11/06/1981Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
34323
5 years T.D.C.