judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00182-CR
10-81-00182-CR
11/09/1981
Forgery
James Edward Johnson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
07/08/1982Case stored
07/08/1982Mandate issued by this Court
04/22/1982Opinion issuedDismissed
04/01/1982Submitted
11/09/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/09/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
13,482
18 Years