judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-81-01185-CR
05-81-01185-CR
11/09/1981
Robbery
Mosley, Roy Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/27/1985Mandate IssuedAffirmed
02/14/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/06/1982Submission
07/28/1982Brief Filed
07/26/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/20/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/07/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/28/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/07/1982Brief Filed
05/07/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/15/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/10/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/08/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
02/08/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
11/09/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1985Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Verla S Holland
F80-4193-KIV
Life, TDC