judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00262-CR
08-81-00262-CR
11/10/1981
Other Drug Sale
Bradley, Larry L.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
10/05/1982Mandate Issued
07/21/1982Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1982Opinion issued
06/29/1982Motion for Dismissal Filed
04/12/1982Record filed.
11/10/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/05/1981Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
171st District Court
El Paso
35030-171
10 yrs.