judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LV JAYCEES SENIOR CITIZENS VS. HENRY C/W 30411/31463

Case Information: 30451
Short Caption:LV JAYCEES SENIOR CITIZENS VS. HENRY C/W 30411/31463Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 30411 *, 30451, 31463 Related Case(s): 30411 , 31463
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A330395Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:05/21/1997 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/16/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/19/1997Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 from Alverson firm-check no. 3341.
05/19/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/20/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. To Transmit Required Document (Exhibit List) to Clark County Clerk. Due date: 10 days.
05/21/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Of Settlement Conference. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
05/29/1997Other Other. Received a certified List of Exhibits (placed in correspondence file).
05/30/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook.
05/30/1997Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Margie L. Carson.
06/02/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
06/04/1997Other Other. Filed Appellant Las Vegas Jaycees Senior Citizens Mobile Home Community Foundation's Motion to Consolidate Nevada Supreme Court Case Numbers 30411 and 30451. (Nos. 30411 and 30451).
06/04/1997TranscriptFiled Transcript. Certified Reporter's Transcript dated March 5, 1997. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. Filed in 30411. (Nos. 30411 and 30451).
06/17/1997Other Other. Filed Reporter's Transcript of Oral Argument-1/16/97; 41(b) Motion-January 15, 1997; Direct Examination of LaVerne Henry-January 13, 1997; Direct Examination of Edward Henry-January 14, 1997; Cross-Examination of Edward Henry-January 14, 1997; Cross-Examination of LaVerne Henry-January 14, 1997. Court Reporter: Margie L. Carlson.
06/23/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. We hereby consolidate the above-entitled matters for all appellate purposes. Notices of settlement conference have been issued by this court for both appeals but have been assigned to different settlement judges. We believe that all of the matters raised by these appeals should be considered by a single settlement judge. We refer this consolidated matter to Settlement Judge E. Leslie Combs for proceedings pursuant to NRAP 16. (Nos. 30411 and 30451).
06/25/1997Other Other. Filed Reporter's Transcript of Motions, Wednesday, January 8, 1997,-Reporter's Transcript of Testimony of Jeff Margolin, Monday, January 13, 1997,-and Reporter's Transcript of Testimony of Jeff Margolin, Wednesday, January 15, 1997-Court Reporter: Margie L. Carlson.
07/24/1997Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. Settlement Conference Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
12/19/1997Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Filing Bankruptcy (nos. 30411 & 30451).
01/28/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The appeal in docket No. 31463 involves the same parties, the same set of facts, and similar issues for review as the consolidated appeals. We elect to consolidate the appeal in Docket No. 31463 with the already consolidated appeals in Docket Nos. 30411 and 30451. We order these consolidated matters stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Counsel for Edward C. Henry, Pyatt & Eglet, shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceeding and whether the automatic stay has been lifted by the bankruptcy court. Nos. 30411, 30451 and 31463.
03/02/1998Other Other. Filed Status Report Re Bankruptcy of Respondent Edward C. Henry. (Nos. 30411, 30451 and 31463).
03/16/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for Edward C. Henry shsll, within 90 days of the date this order, file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
06/12/1998Other Other. Filed Status Report re Bankruptcy of Respondent Edward C. Henry. (Nos. 30411, 30451 and 31463.)
07/16/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for Edward C. Henry shall, within 90 days of the date of this order, file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
10/15/1998Other Other. Filed Status Report re Bankruptcy of Respondent Edward C. Henry. 30411, 30451, 31463.
11/03/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for Edward C. Henry shall, within 60 days of the date of this order, file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
12/30/1998Other Other. Filed Status Report re Bankruptcy of Respondent Edward C. Henry. Nos. 30411, 30451 and 31463.
02/01/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Intent to Execute on Judgment. (Nos. 30411, 30451 and 31463).
02/01/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Entry of Order Approving Application by DeLanoy, English, Schuetze & McGaha, P.C. to be Employed as Special Counsel. (Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463).
02/11/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for Edward C. Henry shall, within 60 days of the date of this order, file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 30411, 30451 31463.
03/25/1999MotionFiled Motion. To Continue Stay Execution of the Judgment Pending Determination of Las Vegas Jaycees' Motions to Stay Execution and for Approval of Supersedeas Bond. (30451 only). Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
06/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On March 25, 1999, Las Vegas Jaycees Senior Citizens filed a motion in docket No. 30451 requesting that this court continue its stay of execution of the judgment pending the resolution of motions filed in the district court to stay the execution of the judgment and for the approval of a supersedeas bond. This court has not previously entered a stay of the execution of the judgment. This appeal was stayed pursuant to the automatic stay provisions of federal bankruptcy law. We deny the motion as moot. Counsel for Edward C. Henry shall, within 10 days from the date of this order, inform this court regarding the status of the bankruptcy proceedings. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
11/12/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Of Entry of Order re: Lifting Automatic Bankruptcy Stay. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
02/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. On November 12, 1999, Las Vegas Jaycees Senior Citizens filed with this court a notice that on October 18, 1999, an order was entered in the United States Bankruptcy Court lifting the automatic stay to allow pursuit of state court appeals. We hereby reinstate briefing in these consolidated appeals and establish the following parallel briefing schedules. Appellant Las Vegas Jaycees Senior Citizens shall, within 40 days from the date of this order, file and serve a single, consolidated opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 30451 and 31463. Appellant Laverne Henry shall, within 40 days from the date of this order, file and serve an opening brief and appendix in Docket No. 30411. Thereafter, these parallel briefing schedules shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
03/02/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Joint Motion and Order that Appellants (Henry and LV Jaycees) may have to and including April 14, 2000, within which to file the opening brief and appendices. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
04/10/2000MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Appellant (LV Jaycees Senior Citizens) may file a brief in excess of 30 pages, to wit: 45 pages. (Requested in No. 30451.) Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
04/17/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Lodged in 30411 only, Appellant Laverne M. Henry). (Mailed on: 4/14/00). Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
04/17/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 5. (Lodged in 30411 only, Appellant Laverne M. Henry). Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
04/18/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's (Las Vegas Jaycees Senior Citizens) Opening Brief. (Lodged in 30451 & 31463 only). (Mailed on: LV Drop Box 4/14/00). Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463
05/18/2000MotionFiled Motion. Respondent Edward Henry's Motion to Extend time to file Answering Brief. (Lodged in Nos. 30451 and 31463 only.) Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
05/19/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Respondent Laverne M. Henry-filed in 30451 & 31463 only). Lodged in 30451 & 31463 only. Mailed on: 5/17/00. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
05/19/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Las Vegas Jaycees Senior Citizens-filed in 30411 only). (Lodged in 30411 only). Mailed on Las Vegas Drop Box 5/17/00. Nos. 30411, 30451 31463.
05/22/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. Respondent Edward C. Henry shall have to and including June 19, 2000, to file an answering brief in Docket Nos. 30451 and 31463. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
05/30/2000Other Other. Filed Non-Opposition to Edward Henry's Motion to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
05/30/2000Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From attorney Whitney C. Wilcher of Eglet Prince law firm. Their law firm and William McGaha of DeLanoy Schuetze & McGaha will be filing a joint answering brief on behalf of Edward Henry. Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
06/19/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Laverne M. Henry) Mailed on: 6/16/00. (Lodged in 30411 only). Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
06/19/2000BriefFiled Brief. Respondent Edward Henry's Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 6/16/00. (Lodged in 30451 and 31463 only.) Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
06/21/2000BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (LV Jaycees) Mailed on: LV Drop Box 6/19/00. (Lodged in 30451 and 31463 only.) Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463.
07/21/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief to Respondent Edward Henry's Answering Brief. (LV Jaycees) Mailed on: LV Drop Box 7/19/00. Lodged in 30451 & 31463 only. (Nos. 30411, 30451, 31463)
03/16/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. Nos. 30411/30451/31463. (01-04783)
03/16/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Southern Nevada Panel. SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 30411/30451/31463.
05/16/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. These are consolidated appeals from a final judgment and rulings on several post-trial motions. fn1[The record reflects that the Henrys established a duty and breach thereof on behalf of the Jaycees and a prima facie case of negligence. We conclude that the district court did not err in denying the Jaycees' motion for a directed verdict based upon a reasonable inference of negligence.] fn2[The Jaycees argue that LaVerne failed to object to the testimony during trial. The record reflects that the district court denied LaVerne's motion in limine to exclude evidence of the Jaycees' charitable function. The motion was renewed and denied at trial. Because the district court erred in admitting evidence regarding the Jaycees' financial status and civic good deeds, ' . . . we ORDER the final judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for a new trial.' fn5[In light of our disposition, we do not reach the remaining issues.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB. Nos. 30411/30451/31463. 01-08138
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08184
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08184