judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CLIFTON M. SIMMONS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1382
Short Caption:CLIFTON M. SIMMONS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Domestic Violence
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM1130-10Filed Date:10/29/2010

Opening Event Date:10/29/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:11/15/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/01/2011
Argued/Submitted:11/09/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/01/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantClifton M. Simmons YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Mona A. Sahaf YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/29/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Regina Michaels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Regina Michaels, Esquire
11/15/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (8/23/10 proc.- 143 pages) (tape) (transferred from appeal no. 10-CM-1084)
11/15/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
12/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 4/25/11
02/02/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 25, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
04/25/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 2, 2011
05/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 2, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/17/2011RECORD INDEX
05/17/2011RECORD COPIES
06/02/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until June 30, 2011 (unopposed)
06/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 30, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/30/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/30/2011APPENDIX
08/01/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
08/01/2011FiledBriefing Completed
09/23/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
10/04/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/09/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Wagner, King, Nebeker
11/09/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Wagner, Nebeker, and King, Senior Judges)
12/01/2011FiledMandate
12/29/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)