judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MICHAEL MUHAMMAD V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1414
Short Caption:MICHAEL MUHAMMAD V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Torts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB7874-09Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/16/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/11/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:02/16/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMichael Muhammad N
Maynard M. Henry YN
Richard E. Patrick NN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Stacy L. AndersonYY
AppelleeBoard of Child Care of United Methodist Church IncN
James S. AistYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/24/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for EITHER having been taken from a NON-APPEALBLE ORDER as to the October 6, 2010 denial OR for having been UNTIMELY FILED from the JANUARY 20, 2010 DISMISSAL. (BY: ETW)
11/24/2010TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
12/13/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
01/06/2011 ORDERED that the OTSC IS HEREBY DISCHARGED to the extent that this APPEAL IS HEREBY TAKEN FROM THE 8/2/10 ORDER denying his motion to reinstate and the 10/6/10 denial of the motino for reconsideration. See Puckrein v. Jenkins, 884 A.2d 46, 53 N.8 (DC 2005). It is *****MORE*****
01/06/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal...SEE HARDCOPY
01/21/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (NO-RT NEEDED for this appeal) (elp)
02/03/2011RECORD INDEX
02/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/07/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/18/2011APPENDIX- aplt
04/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (Board of Child Care of the United Methodist Church, Inc.)
04/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (d.c.) 31 days
04/27/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION-to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief
05/06/2011 On consideration of appellee the District of Columbia's motion for an extension of time to file the brief, and the opposition thereto, it is ORDERED that appellee the District of Columbia's motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. (ETW) elp
05/16/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (d.c.)
05/16/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/11/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Glickman, Blackburne-Rigsby, Schwelb
01/25/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
02/16/2012FiledMandate