judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: JAMES M. SCHOENECKER

Case Information: 10-BG-1416
Short Caption:IN RE: JAMES M. SCHOENECKERClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN430-09Filed Date:11/15/2010

Opening Event Date:11/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/25/2011
Argued/Submitted:01/26/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
William R. RossNY
Wallace E. Shipp NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentJames M. Schoenecker NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/15/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with certified copies of the judgment of conviction in the Circuit Court Branch 4 for Walworth County, Wisconsin, for which respondent pled guilty to misapproriation of identifying information to obtain money, a violation of Wisconsin Statutes Sec 943.201 (2)(a).
12/08/2010ORDER It appearing that respondent pled guilty in the Circuit Court Barnch 4 for Walworth County, Wisconsin, to misappropriation of identification information to obtain money, the Court having received a certified copy of the judgment of conviction, and it appearing tha the offense constitute a serious crime as defined by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (b), it is ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c) that the respondent, James M. Schoenecker, is suspended immediately from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending resolution of this matter, and the Board on Professional Responal Responsibility is directed to institute a formal proceeding to determine the nature of the offense and whether it involves moral turpitude within the meaning of D.C. Code Sec 11-2503 (a)(2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement based on compliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
01/28/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent (D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14)
01/28/2011RECEIVED second address for respondent: 13335 Watertown Plank Road, Suite 216, Elm Grove, WI 53122-2221
05/18/2011REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that the court disbar respondent pursuant to D.C. Code Sec 11-2503(a) based upon his conviction of a crime of moral turpitude per se. The Board further recommends that respondent be afforded an opportunity to correct the defiency in his section 14 (g) affidavit by filing a supplemental affidavit within fourteen (14) days of the date of this report and recommendation. If he does so, we recommend that his disbarment run nunc pro tunc from January 28, 2011. If he does not, we recommend that his disbarment be deemed to run, for purposes of reinstatement from the date he files an compliant affidavit.
05/19/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
06/03/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent (Supplemental)
07/25/2011FiledBriefing Completed
07/26/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary Calendar
11/30/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
01/26/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Oberly, Beckwith, Farrell
03/08/2012FiledDisbarment - Respondent is hereby disbarred from the practice of law in the District of Columbia. For purposes of reinstatement, the period of disbarment shall be deemed to commence on January 28, 2011, the date on which respondent filed an affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g). (OB,BW,FA)