judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE, DMV VS. WILLER

Case Information: 34867
Short Caption:STATE, DMV VS. WILLERCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - CV14770Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Recanzone, MarioSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09042
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Mario G. Recanzone. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
11/16/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 99-11329
12/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 99-12064
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." the parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. SNP/CLK 00-03281
03/02/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.