judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: PAUL D. GLAZE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-08-0231)
Case Number:S-08-0231Case Docketed On:10/20/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Sublette CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: PAUL D. GLAZE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF: PAUL D. GLAZE, Appellant (Claimant-Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Objector-Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul D. GlazeJames R. Salisbury
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 102
Citation:214 P.3d 228

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/20/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/20/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/04/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received Brief of Appellant and copy of Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/18/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
12/18/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's statement of costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/09/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volumes II-III, Agency Record; Volume IV, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
08/19/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remandingOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/27/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
08/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Application for Award of Attorneys' Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/29/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/29/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/02/2009Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal