judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

J. H. BRUNSON, ET UX. v. STATE OF TEXAS

Case: B-1332
B-1332
01/22/1969
Application for Writ of Error
J. H. BRUNSON, ET UX.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/24/1969Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
08/13/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/03/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/24/1969Brief in Support of Petition
08/22/1969Response to Motion filed
08/13/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/30/1969Opinion issued
03/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
03/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/03/1969Response to Petition
01/22/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/22/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. H. Brunson, et ux.Petitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information