judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CURTIS VS. AMES

Case Information: 34880
Short Caption:CURTIS VS. AMESCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35820 , 38345 , 41621
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A312219Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/19/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/24/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/24/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09130
09/24/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
11/18/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David W. Curtis--check no. 6314010454.
12/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-13177
01/14/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-00661
01/19/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Volumes 1 through 23. Mailed on 01/12/00. 00-00861
01/19/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. This is a proper person appeal from an order entered by the district court following a bench trial. fn1[We grant Curtis' motion for leave to appear in proper person for the limited purpose of filing a docketing statement and a response to this order. We note that as Curtis is in proper person, no docketing statement was due from him; accordingly, his motion of September 19, 2000, for leave to file a late docketing statement is denied on this basis. We direct the clerk to file the docketing statement submitted by Curtis on September 26, 2000. No other documents submitted by Curtis in proper person shall be filed absent further order of this court. We defer ruling on all other pending motions at this time.] Curtis shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. We caution Curtis that failure to demonstrate that this court has jurisdiction may result in this court's dismissal of this appeal. 00-18585
10/19/2000Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Proper Person Docketing Statement. 00-16996
01/03/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant. We deny the relief requested therein as moot in light of this order. In addition, respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal, filed on January 14, 1999, is denied as moot.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-00166
01/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 23 this day. 01-00638
01/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 6, 2001. 01-00638