judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GORDON J. CUBBA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0244)
Case Number:S-08-0244Case Docketed On:11/13/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Sentencing 6-10-101 - 6-10-301
Short Title:GORDON J. CUBBA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:GORDON J. CUBBA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantGordon J. CubbaRonald G. Pretty
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 87
Citation:210 P.3d 1086

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/13/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/13/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/13/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/13/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/23/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/03/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/04/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/09/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
02/24/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
02/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/06/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five total volumes. District Court Cr. 28-375 three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder. District Court Cr. 28-401, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/07/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
07/07/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Burke writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/23/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/23/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/27/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/24/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal