judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BETTY MURRAY, ET AL V. ROCK CREEK INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL, ETAL

Case Information: 10-CV-1424
Short Caption:BETTY MURRAY, ET AL V. ROCK CREEK INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Contracts
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB3485-06Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/10/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:05/05/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantBetty MurrayN
Harold E. Brazil YN
Julie Glass Martin NN
AppelleeRock Creek International SchoolN
James S. AistNN
AppelleeJ. Daniel Hollinger N
James S. AistNN
AppelleeWashington Scholarship FundN
Robert M. CaryNN
John S. Williams NN
Paul E. Boehm NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/01/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on November 5, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
12/10/2010RECORD INDEX
12/10/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 2/7/11 no oppo
01/26/2011 On consideration of appellants' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief and the appendix, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellants' brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before February 7, 2011, and appellees' briefs shall be filed on or before March 14, 2011. (JAC) elp
02/07/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/07/2011APPENDIX
02/28/2011APPEARANCE-of Robert M. Cary on behalf (WashingtonScholarship Fund, Inc.)
02/28/2011APPEARANCE- of John S. Williams on behalf of (Washington Scholarship Fund, Inc)
02/28/2011APPEARANCE- of Paul E. Boehm on behalf of (Washington Scholarship Fund, Inc)
02/28/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (joint aples) no oppo to 3/28/11
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file their briefs, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' briefs shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/30/2011 On consideration of this court's order of March 3, 2011, granting appellees' motion for an extension of time to file their briefs on or before March 28, 2011, and it appearing that the briefs have not been filed, it is ORDERED that appellees' shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, submit their briefs, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the briefs or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to being scheduled for consideration on the record and on appellant's brief without further notice. (JAC) elp
04/07/2011STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
04/13/2011 On consideration of the stipulation of dismissal with prejudice filed by the parties, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed and costs to be paid by appellee Rock Creek International School. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (ETW) elp
04/13/2011DISMISSED
05/05/2011MANDATE ISSUED