judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6296
A-6296
04/10/1957
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF DALLAS
HART INVESTMENT COMPANY, SARAH H. LEAKE, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/18/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
07/17/1957Response to Brief filedRespondent
07/13/1957Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
06/11/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/22/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
04/10/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/18/1957Response to Brief filed
07/17/1957Response to Brief filed
07/13/1957Brief in Support of Petition
06/11/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/22/1957Response to Petition
04/10/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
04/10/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sarah H. Leake, et al.Respondent
Hart Investment CompanyRespondent
City of DallasPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information