judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6308
A-6308
04/19/1957
Application for Writ of Error
LAVON HINDMAN, ET AL.
TEXAS LIME COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/09/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/06/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
04/19/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/16/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
10/16/1957Opinion issued
07/09/1957Supplemental Brief filed
06/05/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1957Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1957Document received (See Remarks)
05/06/1957Response to Petition
04/24/1957Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
04/19/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/19/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas Lime Company, et al.Respondent
Lavon Hindman, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information