judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6326
A-6326
05/02/1957
Application for Writ of Error
H. E. DUFF
W. P. MATTHEWS AND PAUL H. PFEIFER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/20/1958Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/05/1957Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
05/13/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/20/1958Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/05/1958Opinion issued
12/05/1957Supplemental Brief filed
07/10/1957Document received (See Remarks)
07/10/1957Document received (See Remarks)
05/13/1957Response to Petition
05/02/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/02/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. P. Matthews and Paul H. PfeiferRespondent
H. E. DuffPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information