judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SOLAREZ VS. COLORADO BELLE

Case Information: 34869
Short Caption:SOLAREZ VS. COLORADO BELLECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A388386Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Rose, YoungCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Eckley M. Keach--check no. 2000.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09171
09/27/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose. Gaming Control Board.
09/27/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Young. Lionel Sawyer & Collins.
09/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: September 28, 1999. 99-09616
10/25/1999MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss Respondent State Gaming Control Board from Action without Preudice. 99-10403
11/05/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Approving Stipulation. Order Partially Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the settlement conference and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed as to respondent State of Nevada, ex rel., Gaming Control Board only." The clerk shall remove the State of Nevada, ex re., Gaming Control Board from the caption of this court's docket forthwith. 99-10903
01/04/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-00113
03/07/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a) and file a docketing statement; 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 00-03564
04/26/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, appellant has failed to file the dockeing statement and either a transcript request form or a certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve the required documents or show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed as abandoned. 00-06757
05/08/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-07511
05/08/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days (mailed docketing statement to counsel for appellant).
05/15/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-08106
10/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall, within 15 days of the date of this order, file and serve the opening brief and appendix. We caution appellant that failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in the immediate dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-18451
01/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has failed to comply with our October 18, 2000, order or otherwise communicate with this court. " . . . we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-00713
02/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-00804
02/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 22, 2001. 01-00804