judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM TANDY RODEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0233)
Case Number:S-08-0233Case Docketed On:10/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:WILLIAM TANDY RODEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM TANDY RODEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam Tandy RodenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Diane Elizabeth Courselle
Zane Allen Gilmer
Jodanna L. Haskins
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 11
Citation:225 P.3d 497

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/29/2008Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
11/21/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
11/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/25/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/26/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/26/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Zane A. Gilmer to appear on behalf of appellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent of Client for Jodanna L. Haskins to appear on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingConsent of ClientFinal
01/27/2009Notice-Incoming - Designation of record on appealNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
03/11/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/16/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
03/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham M. Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/07/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Diane Courselle and Jodanna Haskins for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Diane E. Courselle, Director, DAP, and Jodanna L. Haskins, Student Intern, argument by Ms. Haskins for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
04/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/05/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/22/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
02/22/2010Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
02/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Appellant's Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
03/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/09/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/09/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/09/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal