judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICHARD N. MOONBLATT V. MARK L. ROHRBAUGH

Case Information: 10-DA-0023
Short Caption:RICHARD N. MOONBLATT V. MARK L. ROHRBAUGHClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Small Claims
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SC3-4443-10Filed Date:11/16/2010

Opening Event Date:11/16/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerRichard N. Moonblatt NPro SeN
RespondentMark L. Rohrbaugh NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/16/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL Denied
11/16/2010FILING FEE of $10.00.
11/17/2010TMC - application for allowance of appeal
12/17/2010 ORDERED that the AAA are HEREBY DENIED. See DC Code 11-721 (c) (2001)....(this court will grant an application for AAA only where the applicant demonstrates apparent error or a question of law which has not been but should be decided by this Court)... SEE HARDCOPY (THOBFA) (rm)
02/09/2011RECEIVED - pet for rehearing (returned 2/11/11 for motion for leave)
03/02/2011PETITIONER'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for leave to file a Motion for Reconsideration (Reserved by DCCA on 3/2/11)
03/02/2011RECEIVED - Motion for Reconsideration (Titled as: Request for Rehearing)
03/04/2011TMC - motion for rehearing/request for rehearing
03/10/2011 On consideration of APPLICANT'S MOTION AND REQUEST FOR RE-HEARING construed as a petition for reconsideration, see DC App R. 6(f), it is ORDERED that the PETITION FOR RECONSIDERATION IS DENIED. (THOBFA) (rm)