judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4019
B-4019
05/16/1973
Application for Writ of Error
TOWN OF LINDSAY, TEXAS
COOKE COUNTY ELECTRIC COOPERATIVE ASSOCIATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/08/1974Notice of Appeal filed
12/05/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/30/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/16/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/06/1974Opinion from the Court of Appeals filed.
03/18/1974Miscellaneous Motion
03/08/1974Notice of Appeal filed
01/02/1974Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
12/21/1973Opinion issued
12/11/1973Response to Motion filed
12/05/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
05/30/1973Response to Petition
05/16/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/16/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Town of Lindsay, TexasPetitioner
Cooke County Electric Cooperative AssociationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information