judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KIRT ORLANDO ROYBALL JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0234)
Case Number:S-08-0234Case Docketed On:10/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KIRT ORLANDO ROYBALL JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KIRT ORLANDO ROYBALL JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKirt Orlando Royball Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 79
Citation:210 P.3d 1073

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/09/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/09/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/21/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
01/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and designation of recordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/11/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric M. Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham M. Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/17/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/06/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/06/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 7/8/09ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal