judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4015
B-4015
05/15/1973
Application for Writ of Error
RANGER COUNTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
CHRYSLER CREDIT CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/04/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/13/1973Response to Brief filedRespondent
08/10/1973Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
07/17/1973Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/30/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/09/1973Response to Motion filed
10/04/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/19/1973Opinion issued
09/13/1973Response to Brief filed
08/10/1973Supplemental Brief filed
07/18/1973Miscellaneous letter
07/17/1973Brief on the Merits
06/13/1973Document received (See Remarks)
05/30/1973Response to Petition
05/15/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/15/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ranger County Mutual Insurance Co.Petitioner
CHRYSLER CREDIT CORPORATIONRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information