judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4044
B-4044
05/25/1973
Application for Writ of Error
WALTER MICHAEL WEDELL
A. A. LANDER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/31/1973Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
08/01/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/31/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
05/25/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/10/1973Response to Motion filed
08/31/1973Brief in Support of Petition
08/01/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/31/1973Response to Petition
05/25/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/25/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Walter Michael WedellPetitioner
A. A. LanderRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information