judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-5929
A-5929
06/28/1956
Application for Writ of Error
PESSELL FOWELER, ET AL.
MISSOURI-KANSAS-TEXAS RAILROAD COMPANY OF TEXAS, MISSOURI-KANSAS-TEXAS RAILROAD COMPANY OF TEXAS AND E. O. THOMPSON, W. J. MURRAY, JR. AND OLIN CULBERSON
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/14/1956Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/31/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/14/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
07/13/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
06/28/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/14/1956Brief in Support of Petition
10/31/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/14/1956Response to Petition
07/13/1956Response to Petition
06/28/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/28/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pessell Foweler, et al.Petitioner
Missouri-Kansas-Texas Railroad Company of Texas and E. O. Thompson, W. J. Murray, Jr. and Olin CulbersonRespondent
Missouri-Kansas-Texas Railroad Company of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information