judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-5940
A-5940
07/05/1956
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
SAN ANTONIO RIVER AUTHORITY
JOHN BEN SHEPPERD
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/28/1957Motion for RehearingRelator
10/03/1956Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
10/03/1956Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
10/03/1956Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
10/03/1956Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
09/22/1956Response to Brief filedRelator
07/18/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/27/1957Letter Filed
03/27/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
03/15/1957Response to Motion filed
02/28/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/13/1957Opinion issued
10/03/1956Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/03/1956Exhibits in case/cause filed
10/03/1956Brief in Support of Petition
10/03/1956Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
10/03/1956Order from Lower Court filed
09/22/1956Response to Brief filed
07/18/1956Brief on the Merits
07/18/1956Response to Motion filed
07/05/1956Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John Ben ShepperdRespondent
San Antonio River AuthorityRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information