judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

VADA WHITE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF J. M. WHITE, DECEASED, JOE D. WHITE AND WIFE, BOBBIE WHITE, AND JAMES MURPHY WHITE AND WIFE, SHIRLEY WHITE, OWNERS v. NATURAL GAS PIPELINE COMPANY OF AMERICA

Case: B-1347
B-1347
01/24/1969
Application for Writ of Error
VADA WHITE, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTRIX OF THE ESTATE OF J. M. WHITE, DECEASED, JOE D. WHITE AND WIFE, BOBBIE WHITE, AND JAMES MURPHY WHITE AND WIFE, SHIRLEY WHITE, OWNERS
NATURAL GAS PIPELINE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/24/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/22/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/10/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/09/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/09/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/09/1969Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
04/04/1969Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/06/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
01/24/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/01/1969Response to Motion filed
07/24/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/22/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/09/1969Opinion issued
04/10/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/09/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/09/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/09/1969Supplemental Brief filed
04/04/1969Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/26/1969Document received (See Remarks)
02/06/1969Response to Petition
01/24/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
01/24/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Vada White, individually and as Independent Executrix of the Estate of J. M. White, deceased, Joe D. White and wife, Bobbie White, and James Murphy White and wife, Shirley White, OwnersPetitioner
Natural Gas Pipeline Company of America Respondent
State of TexasAmicus Curiae
Burford, Ryburn and FordAmicus Curiae
Rosser and Carroll and McGinnis, Lockridge, Kilgore, Byfield, Hunter and WilsonAmicus Curiae
Frederick G. Von Huben and Bennett L. SmithAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information