judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3866
B-3866
02/26/1973
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES C. DAY, DAY TRUST, JAMES WOLENHAUS AND CREDIT FACTORING, INC., ET AL.
STATE OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/22/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/13/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
02/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/03/1973Motion to Withdraw Filed
03/26/1973Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
03/22/1973Reply to Response
03/13/1973Response to Petition
03/05/1973Motion to dismissOverruled
02/26/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/26/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
James C. Day, Day Trust, James Wolenhaus and Credit Factoring, Inc., et al.Petitioner
State of TexasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information