judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSHUA SAMUEL V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1420
Short Caption:JOSHUA SAMUEL V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Carjacking
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-15174-09Filed Date:11/10/2010

Opening Event Date:11/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/15/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/14/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoshua Samuel Y
Nancy E. AllenYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Laura G. Coates NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/10/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Nancy E. Allen, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Nancy E. Allen, Esquire
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii)
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10 pgs/tape) 4/2/10 proc.
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (38 pgs/tape) 8/2/10 proc.
03/15/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (19 pgs/tape) 10/22/10 proc. w/cd
03/15/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/17/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/22/2011RECORD COPIES
03/22/2011RECORD INDEX
03/22/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (sealed documents)
04/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 60 days no oppo
04/07/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. (JAC)
06/27/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
06/27/2011APPENDIX
07/27/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)
08/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for extension of time to file the brief on September 1, 2011.
09/01/2011FiledMotion To Dismiss Appeal - or in the alternative motion for summary affirmance (Appellee)Granted
09/06/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE OR TO DISMISS
11/22/2011FiledORDER GRANTING APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS
11/22/2011FiledDismissed
12/14/2011FiledMandate