judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ALAN D. BOE, AN EMPLOYEE OF JIM BRIDGER POWER PLANT, ALAN D. BOE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION

Case Heading (S-08-0240)
Case Number:S-08-0240Case Docketed On:11/03/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Labor and Employment (Title 27)
Short Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ALAN D. BOE, AN EMPLOYEE OF JIM BRIDGER POWER PLANT, ALAN D. BOE v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION
Full Title:IN THE MATTER OF THE WORKER'S COMPENSATION CLAIM OF ALAN D. BOE, AN EMPLOYEE OF JIM BRIDGER POWER PLANT, ALAN D. BOE, Appellant (Petitioner), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex. rel., WYOMING WORKERS' SAFETY AND COMPENSATION DIVISION, Appellee (Respondent).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAlan D. BoeEthelyn (Lynn) Boak
AppelleeDepartment of Employment - Workers' Safety and Compensation DivisionBruce A. Salzburg
John William Renneisen
James Michael Causey
M. Kristen D. Rieman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Workers' Compensation
Opinion Number:2009 WY 115
Citation:216 P.3d 494 (Wyo. 2009).

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Other Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed in District CourtNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
12/22/2008Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/23/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/23/2008Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/21/2009Brief - Appellant (System Error--Due date for brief of Appellee calculated from actual filing date)BriefAppellantFinal
01/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellee/respondent, Wyoming Workers' Safety and Compensation Division; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/11/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/30/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/06/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Agency Record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/02/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
09/17/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing and remanding, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/22/2009Motion - Fees and costsMotionFees and costsFinal
09/22/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Attorney's Fees and CostsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2009Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/14/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/16/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal