judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARK DORR v. SMITH, KELLER & ASSOCIATES

Case Heading (S-08-0219)
Case Number:S-08-0219Case Docketed On:10/03/2008
Linked To: S-08-0220
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:MARK DORR v. SMITH, KELLER & ASSOCIATES
Full Title:MARK DORR, Appellant (Respondent) v. SMITH, KELLER & ASSOCIATES, Appellee (Petitioner).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMark A. DorrGreg L. Goddard
Christopher Michael Wages
AppelleeSmith, Keller & AssociatesW. Perry Dray
Timothy Lance Woznick

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/03/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/03/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/03/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
10/03/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/24/2008Motion - Dismiss - involuntaryMotionDismiss - involuntaryFinal
10/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received motion to dismiss and memorandum of points and authoritiesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/10/2008Response/Objection - Motion to dismiss appeal.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
11/12/2008Order - Dismiss - involuntaryOrderDismiss - involuntaryFinal
12/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal