judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHAWN LAQUA WILLIS V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1404
Short Caption:SHAWN LAQUA WILLIS V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Theft Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD10133-10Filed Date:11/09/2010

Opening Event Date:11/09/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/11/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantShawn Laqua Willis Y
Larry D. Williams YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/09/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Larry Williams, Esquire
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Larry Williams, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to November 10, 2010. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/07/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (98 pgs/Tape - 10/8/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (23 pgs/Tape - 10/12/10 proc.)(w/CD)
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/04/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 4/1/11. no oppo
02/16/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before April 1, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/28/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO to 5/1/11
03/11/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/02/2011APPENDIX
06/06/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/08/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
09/19/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
09/19/2011FiledAffirmed
10/11/2011FiledMandate