judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CLARK CO. SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. RILEY

Case Information: 30274
Short Caption:CLARK CO. SCHOOL DISTRICT VS. RILEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A363590Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/16/1997 / Hoppe, CraigSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:01/10/2000 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Las Vegas Office
Submission Date:01/10/2000How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/14/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Government.
04/14/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
04/15/1997Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due date: 10 days.
04/16/1997Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
04/25/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsReceived Case Appeal Statement. Certfied copy filed in the district court on April 14, 1997.
06/04/1997Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued pursuant to attached document.
07/25/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the completed docketing statement or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed against counsel for appellant.
08/04/1997Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
08/07/1997Other Other. Filed Respose to Appellant's Docketing Statement.
05/14/1998Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter.
05/14/1998Letter/IncomingReceived Letter. From Settlement Judge Craig A. Hoppe re: Status of several pending Settlement Conferences. (Nos. 31538, 31537, 31155, 30599, 31529, 30242, and 30274.)
05/28/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31 (a)(1).
06/08/1998Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification of No Transcript Required.
09/18/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including October 26, 1998, to file the opening brief.
10/23/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Fed Ex 10/22/98).
10/23/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Joint Appendix.
11/23/1998MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Respondent shall have to and including December 24, 1998, to file the answering brief.
12/24/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: hand delivered 12/24/98).
01/25/1999MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Appellant shall have to and including February 26, 1999, to file the Reply brief.
02/26/1999BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: Fed-Ex 2/25/99).
12/03/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is scheduled for January 10, 2000, at the hour of 9:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB).
12/22/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Oral Argument is rescheduled for January 10, 2000, at the hour of 10:30 a.m. for 1/2 hour in Las Vegas. (SNP99B-WM, MS, NB).
12/27/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. Issued oral argument reminder notice.
01/10/2000Other Other. Oral argument before the Southern Nevada Panel: submitted. SNP99B-WM, MS, NB)
01/10/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "Order this Appeal Dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB
03/17/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Publication of Order.
03/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur.
03/29/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Publication of Order.
04/18/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Entering Receipt for Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 3, 2000.
10/13/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to Daniel S. Hussey, counsel for Clark Co. School District, requesting that another copy of the joint appendix be submitted to this court for determination how the motion for publication should be resolved. (The appendix was inadvertently discarded after the remittitur issued.) 00-18250
10/30/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Copy of Joint Appendix originally filed 10/23/98. See docket entry for 10/13/00. Per AH. 00-19119
12/05/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." fn1[We originally dismissed this appeal in an unpublished order on March 2, 2000. On March 17, 2000, appellant filed a motion to publish the order. We grant the motion and publish this opinion in place of our prior unpublished order.] Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 119. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-21221